EP0480911 - Turbocharger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/16] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, 2-chome Minami-Aoyama Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inoue, Kazuo 3-6-1 Takabodai, Nerima-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Hirayama, Takayoki c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyusho 4-1 1-chome Chuo Wako-shi Saitama 351-01 / JP | 03 /
Yano, Shunji 2-13-13 Komazawa, Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Hayama, Masato 5-6-8 Mizonuma Asaka-shi, Saitama / JP | 05 /
Yamaji, Hideo c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijyutsu Kenkyusho 4-1 1-chome Chuo Wako-shi Saitama 351-01 / JP | [1992/39] |
Former [1992/16] | 01 /
Inoue, Kazuo 3-6-1 Takabodai, Nerima-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Hirayama, Takayoki 2-13-2 Asahi-cho Kawagoe-shi, Saitama / JP | |||
03 /
Yano, Shunji 2-13-13 Komazawa, Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
04 /
Hayama, Masato 5-6-8 Mizonuma Asaka-shi, Saitama / JP | |||
05 /
Yamaji, Hideo 6-7-12 Ohizumigakuen-cho, Nerima-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Leale, Robin George, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co.,European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/19] | Leale, Robin George, et al FRANK B. DEHN & CO. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | ||
Former [1992/16] | Hall, Graeme Keith Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 92100233.3 | 07.12.1987 | [1992/16] | Priority number, date | JP19860291174 | 05.12.1986 Original published format: JP 29117486 | JP19860291178 | 05.12.1986 Original published format: JP 29117886 | JP19860291171 | 05.12.1986 Original published format: JP 29117186 | JP19860298190 | 15.12.1986 Original published format: JP 29819086 | JP19860298193 | 15.12.1986 Original published format: JP 29819386 | [1992/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0480911 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0480911 | Date: | 15.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0480911 | Date: | 10.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F01D17/16, F01D25/12, F01D25/24, F01D25/14 | [1992/29] | CPC: |
F01D25/145 (EP,US);
F01D17/165 (EP,US);
F01D25/125 (EP,US);
F05D2220/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/16] | F01D25/12, F01D17/16, F02C6/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/16] | Title | German: | Turbolader | [1992/16] | English: | Turbocharger | [1992/16] | French: | Turbo soufflante | [1992/16] | Examination procedure | 18.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/08] | 07.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP87310751.0 / EP0270384 | Opposition(s) | 13.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3513823 (MTU FRIEDRICHSHAFEN GMBH [DE]); | [X]US3232581 (SWEARINGEN JUDSON S); | [XP]EP0204033 (MTU FRIEDRICHSHAFEN GMBH [DE]); | [A]GB2024330 (BARMAG BARMER MASCHF); | [A]DE1775444 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE); | [A]GB946461 (WALTER EBERSPACHER, et al); | [A]GB1109518 (WESTLAND AIRCRAFT LTD) |