EP0550788 - Substituted valinamide derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.06.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.08.1996 [1996/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/28] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seitz, Thomas, Dr. Mozartstrasse 32 W-4019 Monheim / DE | 02 /
Wollweber, Detlef, Dr. Paul-Ehrlich-Strasse 17 W-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE | 03 /
Brandes, Wilhelm, Dr. Eichendorffstrasse 3 W-5653 Leichlingen 1 / DE | 04 /
Dehne, Heinz-Wilhelm, Dr. Krischer Strasse 81 W-4019 Monheim / DE | [1993/28] | Application number, filing date | 92100313.3 | 10.01.1992 | [1993/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0550788 | Date: | 14.07.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07C271/22, A01N47/12 | [1993/28] | CPC: |
C07C271/22 (EP,KR);
A01N47/12 (EP,KR);
C07C209/06 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL [1993/28] | Title | German: | Substituierte Valinamid-Derivate | [1993/28] | English: | Substituted valinamide derivatives | [1993/28] | French: | Dérivés substitués du valine-amide | [1993/28] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 01.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/48] | 19.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/33] | 15.03.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/33] | Request for further processing for: | 12.07.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 12.07.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.07.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0398072 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [E]EP0472996 (BAYER AG [DE]) |