EP0496254 - Measuring device for electrical measuring of resistance and method therefore [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/31] | For all designated states FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 D-80636 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Konstanzer, Michael, Ing. grad. Britzingerstrasse 36 W-7800 Freiburg / DE | 02 /
Huber, Reinhart Gehrnweg 3 W-7880 Bad Säckingen / DE | [1992/31] | Representative(s) | Schmitt, Hans, et al Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Dreikönigstrasse 13 79102 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/31] | Schmitt, Hans, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. H. Schmitt Dipl.-Ing. W. Maucher Dreikönigstrasse 13 D-79102 Freiburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 92100548.4 | 15.01.1992 | [1992/31] | Priority number, date | DE19914101819 | 23.01.1991 Original published format: DE 4101819 | [1992/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0496254 | Date: | 29.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0496254 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01R27/14 | [1992/31] | CPC: |
G01D5/16 (EP);
G01R27/02 (EP);
G01R27/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1992/31] | Title | German: | Messvorrichtung zur elektrischen Messung eines Widerstandes sowie zugehöriges Messverfahren | [1992/31] | English: | Measuring device for electrical measuring of resistance and method therefore | [1992/31] | French: | Dispositif de mesure pour mesurer électriquement la résistance et méthode pour cela | [1992/31] | Examination procedure | 08.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/10] | 30.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 11.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 17.04.1996 | DK | 17.04.1996 | ES | 17.04.1996 | GR | 17.04.1996 | IT | 17.04.1996 | NL | 17.04.1996 | PT | 17.07.1996 | SE | 17.07.1996 | AT | 15.01.1997 | [2003/07] |
Former [2002/25] | BE | 17.04.1996 | |
DK | 17.04.1996 | ||
ES | 17.04.1996 | ||
GR | 17.04.1996 | ||
IT | 17.04.1996 | ||
PT | 17.07.1996 | ||
SE | 17.07.1996 | ||
AT | 15.01.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | BE | 17.04.1996 | |
DK | 17.04.1996 | ||
GR | 17.04.1996 | ||
IT | 17.04.1996 | ||
PT | 17.07.1996 | ||
SE | 17.07.1996 | ||
AT | 15.01.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 17.04.1996 | |
DK | 17.04.1996 | ||
IT | 17.04.1996 | ||
PT | 17.07.1996 | ||
SE | 17.07.1996 | ||
AT | 15.01.1997 | ||
Former [1998/30] | BE | 17.04.1996 | |
DK | 17.04.1996 | ||
PT | 17.07.1996 | ||
SE | 17.07.1996 | ||
AT | 15.01.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 17.04.1996 | |
DK | 17.04.1996 | ||
PT | 17.07.1996 | ||
SE | 17.07.1996 | ||
Former [1998/14] | BE | 17.04.1996 | |
PT | 17.07.1996 | ||
SE | 17.07.1996 | ||
Former [1997/20] | BE | 17.04.1996 | |
SE | 17.07.1996 | ||
Former [1996/47] | SE | 17.07.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2628573 (THOMSON CSF); | [X]WO8503348 (VOLVO AB [SE]); | [A]EP0174075 (CANADIAN IND [CA]) |