EP0480913 - Apparatus for adhering ribbons to cartridge shell plate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.1996 [1996/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/16] | For all designated states Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 210 Nakanuma Minamiashigara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Koichi, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 210 Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Okutsu, Kazuo, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 210 Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Ide, Yoshihiro, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 2-26-30 Nishiazabu, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Takei, Hiroshi, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 210 Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 05 /
Ishida, Yukio, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 210 Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 06 /
Harada, Kazumasa, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 200 Oonakasato Fujinomiva-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1992/16] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/16] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92100883.5 | 17.09.1987 | [1992/16] | Priority number, date | JP19860219942 | 18.09.1986 Original published format: JP 21994286 | JP19860231422 | 30.09.1986 Original published format: JP 23142286 | JP19860231423 | 30.09.1986 Original published format: JP 23142386 | [1992/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0480913 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0480913 | Date: | 04.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0480913 | Date: | 30.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B26D1/60, B26D5/28, B29C63/00, B21D51/26 | [1992/16] | CPC: |
B21D51/2676 (EP,US);
B26D1/605 (EP,US);
B26D5/28 (EP,US);
B29C63/0039 (EP,US);
G03B17/30 (EP,US);
G03C3/00 (EP,US);
G03B2217/265 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1343 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1734 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, NL [1992/16] | Title | German: | Apparat zum Anbringen von Streifen auf Gehäusebleche | [1992/16] | English: | Apparatus for adhering ribbons to cartridge shell plate | [1992/16] | French: | Appareil pour appliquer des bandes sur des enveloppes métalliques | [1992/16] | Examination procedure | 26.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/17] | 18.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP87113645.3 / EP0260701 | Opposition(s) | 31.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4224888 (TAKAHASHI YUZO, et al); | [Y]US3908342 (RAQUE GLEN F); | [A]USRE29838E ; | [A]US3533881 (BECKMAN GEORGE HAROLD, et al); | [A]US2407253 (CONNER GUY O); | [A]US3228272 (CVACHO DANIEL S, et al) |