EP0512193 - Helmet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.1993 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.02.1994 [1994/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARAI HELMET LIMITED 12, Azuma-cho 2-chome Ohmiya-shi Saitama-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/46] | For all designated states ARAI HELMET LIMITED 12, Azuma-cho 2-chome Ohmiya-shi Saitama-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kohno, Kiyoshi, c/o Arai Helmet, Ltd. 12 Azuma-cho 2-chome Ohmiya-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [1992/46] | Representative(s) | Denmark, James Bailey, Walsh & Co. 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD Yorkshire / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/46] | Denmark, James Bailey, Walsh & Co. 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD Yorkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 92100904.9 | 21.01.1992 | [1992/46] | Priority number, date | JP19910032075 | 09.05.1991 Original published format: JP 3207591 | [1992/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0512193 | Date: | 11.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A42B3/04, G02C11/00 | [1992/46] | CPC: |
A42B3/185 (EP);
A42B3/127 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/46] | Title | German: | Helm | [1992/46] | English: | Helmet | [1992/46] | French: | Casque | [1992/46] | File destroyed: | 28.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 12.05.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/05] | 23.08.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/05] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2449901 ; | [AP]US5052054 ; | [A]US2281152 ; | [A]US4179753 ; | [A]US3823418 ; | [A]US2262142 ; | [A]US4549793 |