EP0508047 - Purifier for waste water [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.09.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.10.1995 [1995/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DORR-OLIVER INCORPORATED 612 Wheeler's Farm Road, P.O.Box 3819 Milford Connecticut 06460-8719 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/42] | For all designated states DORR-OLIVER INCORPORATED 612 Wheeler's Farm Road, P.O.Box 3819 Milford Connecticut 06460-8719 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Becker, Klaus-Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Am Zollstock 14 W-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | [1992/42] | Representative(s) | Weber, Dieter, et al Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Postfach 61 45 65051 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/28] | Weber, Dieter, Dr., et al Weber, Dieter, Dr., Seiffert, Klaus, Dipl.-Phys., Lieke, Winfried, Dr. Postfach 61 45 D-65051 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1992/42] | Weber, Dieter, Dr. Weber, Dieter, Dr., Seiffert, Klaus, Dipl.-Phys., Lieke, Winfried, Dr. Postfach 61 45 D-65051 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 92101305.8 | 28.01.1992 | [1992/42] | Priority number, date | DE19914111760 | 11.04.1991 Original published format: DE 4111760 | [1992/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0508047 | Date: | 14.10.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B01D21/06 | [1992/42] | CPC: |
B01D21/06 (EP);
B01D21/24 (EP);
B01D21/2416 (EP);
B01D21/2427 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1992/42] | Title | German: | Klärbecken für die Abwasserreinigung | [1992/42] | English: | Purifier for waste water | [1992/42] | French: | Clarificateur pour l'épuration des eaux usées | [1992/42] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 22.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/20] | 12.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.05.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/43] | 01.06.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2525842 ; | [A]FR1163132 ; | [A]GB1039146 ; | [A]US2263167 ; | [A]US2267516 ; | [A]DE2102646 |