EP0498261 - Sound insulation for containers, apparatus and pipelines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/33] | For all designated states FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 D-80636 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eckoldt, Dietmar, Dr. Ahornweg 12 W-7037 Magstadt / DE | [1992/33] | Application number, filing date | 92101320.7 | 31.01.1992 | [1992/33] | Priority number, date | DE19914103895 | 08.02.1991 Original published format: DE 4103895 | [1992/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0498261 | Date: | 12.08.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0498261 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0498261 | Date: | 30.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G10K11/16 | [1992/33] | CPC: |
G10K11/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1992/33] | Title | German: | Schallisolierung für Behälter, Apparate und Rohrleitungen | [1992/33] | English: | Sound insulation for containers, apparatus and pipelines | [1992/33] | French: | Isolation du son pour conteneurs, dispositifs et tuyauteries | [1992/33] | Examination procedure | 28.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/33] | 21.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 30.07.1997 | GB | 30.07.1997 | IT | 30.07.1997 | NL | 30.07.1997 | AT | 31.01.1998 | BE | 31.01.1998 | CH | 31.01.1998 | LI | 31.01.1998 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | GB | 30.07.1997 | |
IT | 30.07.1997 | ||
NL | 30.07.1997 | ||
FR | 26.12.1997 | ||
AT | 31.01.1998 | ||
BE | 31.01.1998 | ||
CH | 31.01.1998 | ||
LI | 31.01.1998 | ||
Former [2000/17] | GB | 30.07.1997 | |
IT | 30.07.1997 | ||
FR | 26.12.1997 | ||
AT | 31.01.1998 | ||
BE | 31.01.1998 | ||
CH | 31.01.1998 | ||
LI | 31.01.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | GB | 30.07.1997 | |
IT | 30.07.1997 | ||
FR | 26.12.1997 | ||
AT | 31.01.1998 | ||
BE | 31.01.1998 | ||
Former [1999/34] | GB | 30.07.1997 | |
FR | 26.12.1997 | ||
AT | 31.01.1998 | ||
BE | 31.01.1998 | ||
Former [1999/27] | GB | 30.07.1997 | |
FR | 26.12.1997 | ||
BE | 31.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/30] | GB | 30.07.1997 | |
FR | 26.12.1997 | ||
Former [1998/19] | FR | 26.12.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1924734 (DUNLOP CO LTD); | [Y]US3963094 (NOWIKAS WALTER M); | [A]EP0028002 (ROCKWOOL INT [DK]); | [Y]WO8703327 (BAECHLI EMIL [CH]) | [A] - JOURNAL OF THE ACOUSTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA Bd. 72, Nr. 3, September 1982, NEW YORK US Seiten 834 - 844 J.D. QUIRT 'Sound transmission through windows I. Single and double glazing' |