Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0497303
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
09.04.1999 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 26.05.1999 [1999/21] |
09.04.1998 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 27.05.1998 [1998/22] |
12.03.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.01.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.11.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
28.11.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.08.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
05.08.1997 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
03.04.1997 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
04.02.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.02.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
24.01.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.01.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
21.08.1995 |
First examination report |
|
10.02.1993 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 31.03.1993 [1993/13] |
03.08.1992 |
Publication of search report |
published on 23.09.1992 [1992/39] |
18.06.1992 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.08.1992 [1992/32] |