EP0497303 - Carbamic acid derivatives and method for preparing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1999 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.1999 [1999/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyorin Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. No. 5, Kanda Surugadai 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/32] | For all designated states KYORIN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. No. 5, Kanda Surugadai 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takano, Yasuo 6-4-14, Kuge Kazo-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Takadoi, Masanori 256-32, Nokuki Kuki-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Hirayama, Takashi 3-6-2-304, Sakurada, Washimiya-machi Kitakatsushika-gun, Saitama-ken / JP | 04 /
Yamanishi, Atsuhiro 4687, Tomonuma, Nogi-machi Shimotsuga-gun, Tochigi-ken / JP | [1992/32] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/32] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92101449.4 | 29.01.1992 | [1992/32] | Priority number, date | JP19910031922 | 31.01.1991 Original published format: JP 3192291 | JP19920030071 | 21.01.1992 Original published format: JP 3007192 | [1992/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0497303 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0497303 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0497303 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/04, C07D417/04, C07D401/14, C07D211/40, C07D211/54, C07D211/46, A61K31/445 | [1992/39] | CPC: |
C07D401/04 (EP,KR);
A61P25/28 (EP);
C07D211/60 (EP);
C07D401/14 (EP);
C07D417/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/32] | C07D401/04, C07D417/04, C07D211/40, C07D211/54, A61K31/445 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/32] | Title | German: | Carbaminsäurederivate und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1992/32] | English: | Carbamic acid derivatives and method for preparing the same | [1992/32] | French: | Dérivés de l'acide carbamique et procédé pour leur préparation | [1992/32] | Examination procedure | 02.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/13] | 24.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.08.1997 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP63170356 ; | [X]GB2000136 (PFIZER LTD); | [X]GB2021108 (PFIZER LTD); | [X]EP0169139 (SANOFI SA [FR]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 446 (C-546)(3293) 24 November 1984 & JP-A-63 170 356 ( YAMANOUCHI PHARMACEUT. CO. ) 14 July 1988, & JP63170356 A 19880714 |