EP0497336 - Stirrer for freezing cylinders [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.11.1994 [1994/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRIGOMAT S.r.l. Via 1 Maggio I-20070 Guardamiglio (Milan) / IT | [1992/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Trucco, Dario Via O. Tabacchi, 45 I-10132 Torino / IT | [1992/32] | Representative(s) | Marietti, Giuseppe Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga, 16 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/32] | Marietti, Giuseppe MARIETTI e GISLON S.r.l. Via Larga, 16 I-20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 92101530.1 | 30.01.1992 | [1992/32] | Priority number, date | IT1991MI00256 | 01.02.1991 Original published format: IT MI910256 | [1992/41] |
Former [1992/32] | deleted | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0497336 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0497336 | Date: | 15.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A23G9/22 | [1992/32] | CPC: |
A23G9/224 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1992/32] | Title | German: | Rührer für Gefrierzylinder | [1992/32] | English: | Stirrer for freezing cylinders | [1992/32] | French: | Agitateur pour cylindre de congélation | [1992/32] | File destroyed: | 31.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 16.03.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/48] | 05.07.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.04.1994 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2746730 (SWENSON HARVEY F, et al); | [A]US2836401 (PHELAN LOUIS A M); | [Y]US2847197 (THOMPSON JR EMERY); | [A]US3170676 (KOCH LAWRENCE E); | [A]US3641783 (WERNER BERNFRIED M); | [X]FR2218133 (BOMBARDIERI ADRIANO [IT]) |