EP0507052 - Contamination dosimeter with radiation-RAM for alpha particles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.12.1993 [1993/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MIKROELEKTRONIK UND TECHNOLOGIE GESELLSCHAFT mbH Grenzstrasse 28, PF 34 01109 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/41] | For all designated states MIKROELEKTRONIK UND TECHNOLOGIE GESELLSCHAFT mbH Grenzstrasse 28, PF 34 D-01109 Dresden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Junghans, Bernd, Prof. Dr. Strasse der Befreiung 2 O-8060 Dresden / DE | 02 /
Hübler, Peter Leutewitzer Ring 70 O-8038 Dresden / DE | 03 /
Streil, Thomas, Dr. Helbigsdorfer Weg 20 O-8038 Dresden / DE | 04 /
Kelm, Georg, Dr. Alexander-Herzen-Strasse 32 O-8080 Dresden / DE | 05 /
Sauer, Bodo Lange Strasse 41 O-8028 Dresden / DE | 06 /
Scade, Andreas, Dipl.-Phys. Schützenhofstrasse 6 O-8023 Dresden / DE | 07 /
Raab, Michael Mittlere Bergstrasse 57 O-8122 Radebeul / DE | 08 /
Mach, Wolfgang Leutewitzer Strasse 23 O-8010 Dresden / DE | 09 /
Jähne, Rolf Rostocker Strasse 13 O-8080 Dresden / DE | 10 /
Kluge, Wolfram Alexander-Herzen-Strasse 30 O-8080 Dresden / DE | 11 /
Lippmann, Frank, Dr. Liebigstrasse 22 O-8027 Dresden / DE | 12 /
Ullmann, Werner, Dr. Helmholtzstrasse 32 O-1160 Berlin / DE | 13 /
Feddersen, Christian, Dr. K.-Polcern-Strasse 14 O-1162 Berlin / DE | [1992/41] | Application number, filing date | 92101581.4 | 31.01.1992 | [1992/41] | Priority number, date | DE19914110090 | 28.03.1991 Original published format: DE 4110090 | [1992/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0507052 | Date: | 07.10.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01T1/00 | [1992/41] | CPC: |
G01T1/026 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1992/41] | Title | German: | Kontaminationsdosimeter mit Radiation-RAM für Alpha-Strahlen | [1992/41] | English: | Contamination dosimeter with radiation-RAM for alpha particles | [1992/41] | French: | Dosimètre de contamination muni d'une radiation-RAM pour rayons alpha | [1992/41] | File destroyed: | 16.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 08.04.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/49] | 13.07.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4983843 ; | [A]US4413401 ; | [AD]DE3049153 ; | [AD]DE2926491 ; | [Y]JPS6361983 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12no. 284 (P-740)4. August 1988 & JP-A-63 061 983 ( NEC CORP. ) 18. März 1988 | [Y] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRON DEVICES. Bd. 37, Nr. 3, M{rz 1990NEW YORK US Seiten 804 - 806; J.W. PABST ET AL.: 'Ion-Implanted p-n Junction Capacitors for Ga-As DRAM's' | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRON DEVICES. Bd. 36, Nr. 9-I, September 1989NEW YORK US Seiten 1644 - 1650; KAN TAKEUCHI ET AL.: 'Alpha-particle-induced charge collection measurements for Megabit DRAM cell' |