Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
01.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.07.1995 [1995/29] |
10.06.1994 | (Expected) grant | published on 27.07.1994 [1994/30] |
17.12.1993 | First examination report | |
24.07.1992 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 09.09.1992 [1992/37] |
24.07.1992 | Request for examination filed | published on 09.09.1992 [1992/37] |