Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0502322 | Global Dossier | 27.07.1994 | B1 | EP0502322 | 09.09.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4106865 | 05.03.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4106865 | 23.04.1992 | C1 | Priority number | Date | DE4106865 | 05.03.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59200304D1 | 01.09.1994 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE4106865 | 05.03.1991 |