EP0502322 - Windscreen washing arrangement with a fastening device for mounting of same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.1995 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.07.1995 [1995/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MERCEDES-BENZ AG Mercedesstrasse 136 70327 Stuttgart / DE | For all designated states VDO Adolf Schindling AG Gräfstrasse 103 D-60487 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/37] | For all designated states MERCEDES-BENZ AG Mercedesstrasse 136 D-70327 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For all designated states VDO Adolf Schindling AG Gräfstrasse 103 D-60487 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schacher, Ralf Schubertstrasse 12 W-7030 Böblingen 4 / DE | 02 /
Pfeiffer, Martin, Dipl.-Ing. Friedrichsberg 52 W-7000 Stuttgart 80 / DE | 03 /
Vogt, Gerhard Am Höberück 37 W-6440 Bebra-Breitenbach / DE | 04 /
Sieber, Roland Unter der Schanze W-6442 Rotenburg (Fulda) / DE | [1992/37] | Application number, filing date | 92101668.9 | 01.02.1992 | [1992/37] | Priority number, date | DE19914106865 | 05.03.1991 Original published format: DE 4106865 | [1992/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0502322 | Date: | 09.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0502322 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/52 | [1992/37] | CPC: |
B60S1/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1992/37] | Title | German: | Scheibenwascheinrichtung mit einem Halteteil zu deren Befestigung | [1992/37] | English: | Windscreen washing arrangement with a fastening device for mounting of same | [1992/37] | French: | Dispositif de lavage de pare-brise avec un dispositif de retenu pour sa fixation | [1992/37] | Examination procedure | 03.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/37] | 22.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0174521 (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]); | [A]EP0353643 (AUDI AG [DE]); | [AD]DE2945860 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 136 (M-304)(1573) 23. Juni 1984 | Examination | JP59034965 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 136 (M-304)(1573) 23. Juni 1984; & JP-A-59 034965 (Nissan) 25. Februar 1984, & JP59034965 A 00000000 |