EP0502323 - Electronic balance with digital display [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.1996 [1996/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SARTORIUS AG Weender Landstrasse 94-108 37075 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/37] | For all designated states SARTORIUS AG Weender Landstrasse 94-108 D-37070 Göttingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schubart, Bernd Ruhstrathöhe 2 d W-3400 Göttingen / DE | 02 /
Thornagel, Klaus Am Weinberge 19 W-3406 Bovenden / DE | [1992/37] | Representative(s) | Köhler, Rudolf c/o Sartorius GmbH Weender Landstrasse 94-108 37070 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/37] | Köhler, Rudolf c/o Sartorius GmbH Weender Landstrasse 94-108 D-37070 Göttingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 92101682.0 | 01.02.1992 | [1992/37] | Priority number, date | DE19914107104 | 06.03.1991 Original published format: DE 4107104 | [1992/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0502323 | Date: | 09.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0502323 | Date: | 14.10.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0502323 | Date: | 08.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01G23/36, G09F9/30 | [1992/42] | CPC: |
G01G23/3721 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/37] | G01G23/37 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, NL [1992/37] | Title | German: | Elektronische Waage mit Digitalanzeige | [1992/37] | English: | Electronic balance with digital display | [1992/37] | French: | Balance électronique à affichage digital | [1992/37] | Examination procedure | 17.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/47] | 06.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.08.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1995 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   25.03.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE2718769 (SARTORIUS WERKE GMBH); | [Y]DE8618818U ; | [A]US4242980 (GO THIAM L); | [A]EP0132054 (SHIMADZU CORP [JP]); | [A]LU80622 (METTLER INSTRUMENTE AG [CH]); | [A]DE2651542 (SPINNER GEORG) |