EP0520135 - Overpressure valve device for the cooling circuit of a water-cooled internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.08.1995 [1995/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Längerer & Reich GmbH & Co. D-70790 Filderstadt / DE | [1993/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lindner, Hartmut Gymnasiumstrasse 26 W-7024 Filderstadt 1-Bernhausen / DE | 02 /
Müller, Armin, Dipl.-Ing. (BAMB) Silberburgstrasse 32 W-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | [1993/01] | Representative(s) | Kratzsch, Volkhard Patentanwalt Postfach 90 73701 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | Kratzsch, Volkhard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Postfach 90 D-73701 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 92101780.2 | 04.02.1992 | [1993/01] | Priority number, date | DE19914121086 | 26.06.1991 Original published format: DE 4121086 | [1993/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0520135 | Date: | 30.12.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0520135 | Date: | 07.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F01P11/02, B65D51/00 | [1993/01] | CPC: |
F01P11/0238 (EP);
F01P3/2207 (EP);
F01P11/029 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1993/01] | Title | German: | Überdruckventileinrichtung für den Kühlkreislauf einer flüssigkeitsgekühlten Brennkraftmaschine | [1993/01] | English: | Overpressure valve device for the cooling circuit of a water-cooled internal combustion engine | [1993/01] | French: | Dispositif de soupape de surpression pour un circuit de refroidissement d'un moteur à combustion interne refroidi par liquide | [1993/01] | Examination procedure | 29.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/13] | 26.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2732971 ; | [A]US2147727 (WHITE JAMES A, et al); | [A]EP0388765 (BLAU KG KRAFTFAHRZEUGTECH [DE], et al); | [A]FR2529951 (RENAULT VEHICULES IND [FR]) |