EP0498455 - Magneto-optic recording method and magneto-optic recording/reproducing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.1998 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/33] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakao, Isamu c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Fukumoto, Atsushi c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Udagawa, Toshiki c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Yoshimura, Shunji c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1992/33] | Representative(s) | Müller, Frithjof E. Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/33] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92102084.8 | 07.02.1992 | [1992/33] | Priority number, date | JP19910018078 | 08.02.1991 Original published format: JP 1807891 | [1992/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0498455 | Date: | 12.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0498455 | Date: | 09.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0498455 | Date: | 16.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G11B11/10, G11B13/04 | [1997/16] | CPC: |
G11B11/10502 (EP,US);
G11B7/007 (KR);
G11B11/10532 (EP,US);
G11B11/10586 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/33] | G11B11/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB [1992/33] | Title | German: | Magnetooptisches Aufzeichnungsverfahren und magnetooptisches Aufzeichnungs-/Wiedergabegerät | [1992/33] | English: | Magneto-optic recording method and magneto-optic recording/reproducing apparatus | [1992/33] | French: | Méthode d'enregistrement magnétooptique et appareil magnétooptique pour l'enregistrement /reproduction | [1992/33] | Examination procedure | 06.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/26] | 18.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0318925 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]US4932012 (KOBAYASHI TADASHI [JP]); | [A]EP0393652 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) |