EP0503284 - A three-stage, at least duplicated ATM-self-routing coupling arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.04.1997 [1997/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/38] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Göldner, Ernst-Heinrich, Dr. Deffreggerstrasse 12 W-8000 München 90 / DE | [1992/38] | Application number, filing date | 92102214.1 | 10.02.1992 | [1992/38] | Priority number, date | EP19910103976 | 14.03.1991 Original published format: EP 91103976 | [1992/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0503284 | Date: | 16.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0503284 | Date: | 24.04.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56, H04Q3/68 | [1992/38] | CPC: |
H04L12/5601 (EP,US);
H04L49/106 (EP,US);
H04L49/1553 (EP,US);
H04L49/1576 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0478 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/38] | Title | German: | Dreistufige, zumindest gedoppelte ATM-Koppelanordnung | [1992/38] | English: | A three-stage, at least duplicated ATM-self-routing coupling arrangement | [1992/38] | French: | Dispositif de couplage à auto-acheminement à trois étages avec au moins une structure dédoublée | [1992/38] | Examination procedure | 08.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/19] | 23.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.09.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4400627 (ZOLA MEYER J [US]); | [A]EP0384961 (ANT NACHRICHTENTECH [DE]); | [A]EP0412343 (SEL ALCATEL AG [DE], et al) | [A] - IEEE INFOCOM '90 , SAN FRANSISCO , CA, US; WASHINGTON, US Seiten 668 - 676; S. LIEW ET AL.: 'Performance Analysis of Asymmetric Packet Switch Modules with Channel Grouping' | [A] - ELECTRONICS LETTERS. Bd. 26, Nr. 16, August 1990, ENAGE GB Seiten 1286 - 1287; H.OBARA ET AL.: 'Self-routing fast packet switch with in-service modulator growth' |