EP0499280 - Throwaway milling cutter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 5-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/43] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 5-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1992/34] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORPORATION 6-1, Otemachi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arai, Tatsuo, c/o Tsukuba-Seisakusho MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP., 1511, Ooaza Furumagi Ishige-machi, Yuuki-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 02 /
Saito, Takayoshi, c/o Tsukuba-Seisakusho MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP., 1511, Ooaza Furumagi Ishige-machi, Yuuki-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | [1992/47] |
Former [1992/34] | 01 /
Arai, Tatsuo, c/o Tsukuba-Seisakusho 1511, Ooaza Furumagi, Ishige-machi Yuuki-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Saito, Takayoshi, c/o Tsukuba-Seisakusho 1511, Ooaza Furumagi, Ishige-machi Yuuki-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Füchsle, Klaus, et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/34] | Füchsle, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92102527.6 | 14.02.1992 | [1992/34] | Priority number, date | JP19910021081 | 14.02.1991 Original published format: JP 2108191 | JP19910008392 | 22.02.1991 Original published format: JP 839291 | JP19910017606 | 22.03.1991 Original published format: JP 1760691 | JP19910017607 | 22.03.1991 Original published format: JP 1760791 | JP19910017608 | 22.03.1991 Original published format: JP 1760891 | [1992/47] |
Former [1992/34] | JP19910008392 | 22.02.1991 | |
JP19910017606 | 22.03.1991 | ||
JP19910017607 | 22.03.1991 | ||
JP19910017608 | 22.03.1991 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0499280 | Date: | 19.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0499280 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B23C5/24 | [1992/34] | CPC: |
B23C5/2462 (EP,US);
B23C5/2226 (EP,US);
B23C5/2252 (EP,US);
B23C5/24 (EP,US);
Y10T407/1912 (EP,US);
Y10T407/1928 (EP,US);
Y10T407/1938 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/34] | Title | German: | Fräswerkzeug mit Schneideinsatz | [1992/34] | English: | Throwaway milling cutter | [1992/34] | French: | Fraise à plaquette amovible | [1992/34] | Examination procedure | 11.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/10] | 13.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 03.05.1995 | IT | 03.05.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 03.05.1995 | |
FR | 29.09.1995 | ||
Former [1996/01] | FR | 29.09.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2757273 (HEINLEIN HANS); | [X]EP0167504 (SECO TOOLS AB [SE]) |