EP0504599 - Zirconium silicate occlusion pigments with spinel occlusions, their preparation and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.03.1996 [1996/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60311 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/39] | For all designated states Degussa Aktiengesellschaft Weissfrauenstrasse 9 D-60311 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Speer, Dietrich, Dr. Grünaustrasse 5 W-6450 Hanau 9 / DE | 02 /
Kiss, Akos, Dr. Greifenhagenstrasse 10 A W-6450 Hanau 9 / DE | 03 /
Kleinschmit, Peter, Prof. Wildaustrasse 19 W-6450 Hanau 9 / DE | 04 /
Zell, Christel Bulaustrasse 11 W-6458 Rodenbach / DE | [1992/39] | Application number, filing date | 92102643.1 | 18.02.1992 | [1992/39] | Priority number, date | DE19914108623 | 16.03.1991 Original published format: DE 4108623 | [1992/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0504599 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0504599 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0504599 | Date: | 29.03.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/00, C04B35/48, C04B35/26 | [1993/12] | CPC: |
C09C1/0081 (EP,US);
C01P2002/08 (US);
C01P2002/32 (US)
|
Former IPC [1992/39] | C09C1/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1992/39] | Title | German: | Einschlusspigmente aus Zirkoniumsilikat mit Spinelleinschlüssen, deren Herstellung und Verwendung | [1992/39] | English: | Zirconium silicate occlusion pigments with spinel occlusions, their preparation and their use | [1992/39] | French: | Pigments d'occlusion de silicate de zirconium à occlusions de spinelle, préparation et utilisation | [1992/39] | Examination procedure | 18.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/39] | 01.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0074779 (BRITISH CERAMIC RES ASS [GB]); | [AP]EP0455933 (DEGUSSA [DE]) | [AD] - CHEMIKER ZEITUNG, Nr. 7/8, 1977, HEIDELBERG, DE, 101. JAHRGANG Seiten 319 - 323 A. BROLL ET AL. | [A] - SPRECHSAAL, Bd. 115, Nr. 1, 1982, COBURG, DE Seiten 43 - 46 B. CAMARA ET AL. | [A] - SILIKATTECHNIK, Bd. 37, Nr. 10, 1986, BERLIN, DE Seiten 350 - 352 J. ROTSCHE |