EP0500045 - Process of processing silver halide photographic material and photographic processing composition having a fixing ability [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/20] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | ||
Former [1992/35] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kojima, Tetsuro, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 210 Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Watanabe, Nobuo, c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. No. 210 Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1992/35] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/35] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92102680.3 | 18.02.1992 | [1992/35] | Priority number, date | JP19910045459 | 19.02.1991 Original published format: JP 4545991 | [1992/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0500045 | Date: | 26.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0500045 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G03C5/38, G03C7/42 | [1992/35] | CPC: |
G03C5/38 (EP,US);
G03C7/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1992/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verarbeitung eines photographischen Silberhalogenidmaterials und photographische Fixierzusammensetzung | [1992/35] | English: | Process of processing silver halide photographic material and photographic processing composition having a fixing ability | [1992/35] | French: | Procédé de traitement d'un matériau photographique à l'halogénure d'argent et composition photographique ayant une capacité de fixage | [1992/35] | Examination procedure | 12.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/01] | 16.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.02.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 13.05.1998 | NL | 13.05.1998 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | NL | 13.05.1998 | |
FR | 09.10.1998 | ||
Former [1999/22] | FR | 09.10.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58122535 ; | [X]GB959807 (AGFA AG); | [X]US3712818 (NITTEL F, et al); | [A]US3772020 (SMITH E); | [A]FR2173894 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]); | [A]US3240603 (HORST SCHULER, et al) | [X] - GRANT HAIST 'modern photographic proceessing volume 1' 1979 , JOHN WILEY AND SONS | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 234 (P-230)(1379) 18 October 1983 & JP-A-58 122 535 ( MITSUBISHI SEISHI KK ) 21 July 1983, & JP58122535 A 19830721 |