EP0502361 - Trench shoring device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.1994 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.06.1994 [1994/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TESKA VERBAUTECHNIK GmbH Stubbenbaum 19-44 D-46049 Oberhausen / DE | [1992/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krings, Josef Hans-Böckler-Strasse 21 W-5138 Heinsberg / DE | [1992/37] | Representative(s) | Rauh, Wolfgang Kurt Patentanwalt Mittelstrasse 55 52072 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/37] | Rauh, Wolfgang K., Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Mittelstrasse 55 D-52072 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 92102787.6 | 20.02.1992 | [1992/37] | Priority number, date | DE19914106698 | 02.03.1991 Original published format: DE 4106698 | DE19914111266 | 08.04.1991 Original published format: DE 4111266 | [1992/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0502361 | Date: | 09.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0502361 | Date: | 23.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | E02D17/08 | [1992/37] | CPC: |
E02D17/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1992/37] | Title | German: | Grabenverbauvorrichtung | [1992/37] | English: | Trench shoring device | [1992/37] | French: | Dispositif de blindage de tranchée | [1992/37] | Examination procedure | 07.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/41] | 13.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.12.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AU482602B ; | [AD]DE2948458 (KRINGS JOSEF); | [A]EP0039960 (MAASCOM BV [NL], et al) |