EP0500091 - Television telephone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/29] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-0062 / JP | ||
Former [1992/35] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gotoh, Hiroshi, Hitachi Maioka Dai2 Shataku 1-5, 122 Maioka-machi, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Ishida, Kiyoshi Hitachi Fukiage-ryo 3201, 487 Harajuku-cho Totsuka-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Shibata, Yoji 3-42-4 Ohyabe Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Takahashi, Masahiro 1-12-6 Minamikouya-cho, Hitachi-shi Ibaragi-ken / JP | 05 /
Takizawa, Masaaki 3-47-8-502 Kouenjiminami Suginami-ku, Tokyo-to / JP | 06 /
Yokoi, Kenji Res. Acacie 912 M3 20089 Basiglio MI / IT | 07 /
Mikamo, Katsumi 888-18 Ichige Katsuta-shi, Ibaragi-ken / JP | 08 /
Matsubayashi, Yoshinobu 1-14-35 Kurihamadai Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 09 /
Ishinabe, Iwao Hitachi Fukiage-ryo, 487 Harajuku-cho Totsuka-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 10 /
Watanuki, Toshiaki 610 Takakura Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 11 /
Furuya, Jun 2-201, 2-1-15 Honda Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo-to / JP | 12 /
Yoshimaru, Takushi Hitachi Desin Shoin-ryo, 2-33-11 Nishi-machi Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo-to / JP | [1998/29] |
Former [1992/40] | 01 /
Gotoh, Hiroshi, Hitachi Maioka Dai2 Shataku 1-5, 122 Maioka-machi, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Ishida, Kiyoshi Hitachi Fukiage-ryo 3201, 487 Harajuku-cho Totsuka-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Shibata, Yoji 3-42-4 Ohyabe Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Takahashi, Masahiro 1-12-6 Minamikouya-cho, Hitachi-shi Ibaragi-ken / JP | |||
05 /
Takizawa, Masaaki 3-47-8-502 Kouenjiminami Suginami-ku, Tokyo-to / JP | |||
06 /
Yokoi, Kenji Res. Acacie 912 M3 20089 Basiglio MI / it | |||
07 /
Mikamo, Katsumi 888-18 Ichige Katsuta-shi, Ibaragi-ken / JP | |||
08 /
Matsubayashi, Yoshinobu 1-14-35 Kurihamadai Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
09 /
Ishinabe, Iwao Hitachi Fukiage-ryo, 487 Harajuku-cho Totsuka-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
10 /
Watanuki, Toshiaki 610 Takakura Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
11 /
Furuya, Jun 2-201, 2-1-15 Honda Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo-to / JP | |||
12 /
Yoshimaru, Takushi Hitachi Desin Shoin-ryo, 2-33-11 Nishi-machi Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo-to / JP | |||
Former [1992/35] | 01 /
Gotoh, Hiroshi, Hitachi Maioka Dai2 Shataku 1-5, 122 Maioka-machi, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Ishida, Kiyoshi Hitachi Fukiage-ryo 3201, 487 Harajuku-cho Totsuka-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Shibata, Yoji 3-42-4 Ohyabe Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Takahashi, Masahiro 1-12-6 Minamikouya-cho, Hitachi-shi Ibaragi-ken / JP | |||
05 /
Takizawa, Masaaki 3-47-8-502 Kouenjiminami Suginami-ku, Tokyo-to / JP | |||
06 /
Yokoi, Kenji Green Hights Makinohara 3-506, 2-6 Makinohara Matsudo-shi, Chiba-ken / JP | |||
07 /
Mikamo, Katsumi 888-18 Ichige Katsuta-shi, Ibaragi-ken / JP | |||
08 /
Matsubayashi, Yoshinobu 1-14-35 Kurihamadai Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
09 /
Ishinabe, Iwao Hitachi Fukiage-ryo, 487 Harajuku-cho Totsuka-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
10 /
Watanuki, Toshiaki 610 Takakura Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
11 /
Furuya, Jun 2-201, 2-1-15 Honda Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo-to / JP | |||
12 /
Yoshimaru, Takushi Hitachi Desin Shoin-ryo, 2-33-11 Nishi-machi Kokubunji-shi, Tokyo-to / JP | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Altenburg, Udo, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/28] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Postfach 86 06 20 D-81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/35] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner Postfach 86 06 20 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92102824.7 | 20.02.1992 | [1992/35] | Priority number, date | JP19910025987 | 20.02.1991 Original published format: JP 2598791 | JP19910025991 | 20.02.1991 Original published format: JP 2599191 | [1992/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0500091 | Date: | 26.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0500091 | Date: | 08.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0500091 | Date: | 15.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/14 | [1992/35] | CPC: |
H04N5/45 (EP,US);
H04N7/141 (EP,US);
H04N7/142 (EP,US);
H04N7/147 (EP,US);
H04N7/148 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0457 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0471 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13034 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13091 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13096 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13103 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13106 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13175 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13176 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13179 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13204 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13209 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/1332 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB [1992/35] | Title | German: | Videofernsprechgerät | [1992/35] | English: | Television telephone | [1992/35] | French: | Dispositif vidéophone | [1992/35] | Examination procedure | 20.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/35] | 08.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 16.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP97122840.8 / EP0836323 | Opposition(s) | 16.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2069088 ; | [A]JP61030888 ; | [AD]JP2022989 ; | [A]US4258387 (LEMELSON JEROME H, et al); | [A]EP0310477 (GUICHARD JACQUES [FR], et al); | [AD]EP0348623 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [XP] - "FOR VIDEOPHONES, LIGHT AT THE END OF A VERY LONG TUNNEL.", DATA COMMUNICATIONS., MCGRAW HILL. NEW YORK., US, US, (19911201), vol. 20., no. 17., ISSN 0363-6399, page 116., XP000246819 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 248 (E-933)28 May 1990 & JP-A-20 69 088 ( FUJITSU LTD ) 8 March 1990, & JP2069088 A 19900308 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 184 (E-415)27 June 1986 & JP-A-61 030 888 ( NIPPON TELEGR & TELEPH CORP ) 13 February 1986, & JP61030888 A 19860213 | [A] - ELECTRONICS. DE 1984 A 1985 : ELECTRONICS WEEK vol. 49, no. 7, 1 April 1976, NEW YORK US page 36 'BELL'S VISUAL TERMINAL USES PLASMA DISPLAY' | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 166 (E-911)30 March 1990 & JP-A-20 22 989 ( MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD ) 25 January 1990, & JP2022989 A 19900125 |