Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
25.07.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.09.1997 [1997/37] |
12.04.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
19.02.1997 | Renewal fee | |
01.11.1996 | First examination report | |
31.10.1996 | Examination report or reply | |
29.02.1996 | Renewal fee | |
17.11.1994 | Change - applicant | published on 04.01.1995 [1995/01] |
11.08.1994 | Publication of search report | published on 28.09.1994 [1994/39] |
17.07.1992 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 02.09.1992 [1992/36] |
17.07.1992 | Request for examination filed | published on 02.09.1992 [1992/36] |