Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
25.10.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.12.1993 [1993/50] |
21.06.1993 | First examination report | |
25.11.1992 | Request for examination filed | published on 13.01.1993 [1993/02] |
21.08.1992 | Publication of search report | published on 14.10.1992 [1992/42] |
14.08.1992 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 30.09.1992 [1992/40] |