EP0524369 - Novel device for selective magnetization and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.1995 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.08.1995 [1995/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/04] | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION Armonk, NY 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Munekata, Hiroo 39 Archer Road Mahopac, New York 10541 / US | [1993/04] | Representative(s) | Klocke, Peter IBM Deutschland Management & Business Support GmbH Patentwesen u. Urheberrecht 71137 Ehningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/04] | Klocke, Peter, Dipl.-Ing. IBM Deutschland Informationssysteme GmbH Patentwesen und Urheberrecht Pascalstrasse 100 D-70569 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 92103001.1 | 22.02.1992 | [1993/04] | Priority number, date | US19910725850 | 03.07.1991 Original published format: US 725850 | [1993/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0524369 | Date: | 27.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0524369 | Date: | 07.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01F1/00, H01L43/00, H01L43/10 | [1993/14] | CPC: |
H10N50/85 (EP,US);
H01F1/401 (EP,US);
H01F1/405 (EP,US);
H10N50/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/04] | H01L45/00, H01F1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/04] | Title | German: | Neue Anordnung zur selektiven Magnetisierung und Verfahren | [1993/04] | English: | Novel device for selective magnetization and method | [1993/04] | French: | Dispositif nouveau pour la magnétisation sélective et méthode | [1993/04] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 19.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/28] | 30.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/32] | 13.03.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1995 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0121271 (STICHTING KATHOLIEKE UNIV [NL], et al); | [X]US4823177 (PRINZ GARY A [US], et al); | [A]EP0400263 (IBM [US]) |