EP0507071 - Compression spring fluid motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.1997 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.1997 [1997/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANK AND ROBYN WALTON 1990 FAMILY TRUST 896 N. Mill St. Lewisville Texas 75067 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/41] | For all designated states FRANK AND ROBYN WALTON 1990 FAMILY TRUST 896 N. Mill St. Lewisville, Texas 75067 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Walton, Frank 125 Pheasant Run Road, Canyon Oaks Estates Argyle, Texas 76226 / US | [1992/41] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/41] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92103102.7 | 24.02.1992 | [1992/41] | Priority number, date | US19910674792 | 25.03.1991 Original published format: US 674792 | [1992/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0507071 | Date: | 07.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0507071 | Date: | 08.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F04B9/10, F01L21/04 | [1992/41] | CPC: |
F04B9/1053 (EP,US);
F01L21/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/41] | Title | German: | Druckfeder-Fluidmotor | [1992/41] | English: | Compression spring fluid motor | [1992/41] | French: | Moteur à fluide avec ressort de compression | [1992/41] | Examination procedure | 02.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/22] | 19.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE86337 ; | [AD]US4558715 (WALTON FRANK A [US], et al); | [A]US4756329 (CLOUP JEAN [FR]) |