EP0501430 - PCM signal recording method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/36] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagai, Yutaka 11-17, Hinominami-5-chome, Konan-ku Yokohama-shi / JP | 02 /
Takeuchi, Toshifumi Obirinhaitsu 109, 307-2, Minesawacho, Hodogaya-ku Yokohama-shi / JP | 03 /
Arai, Takao 65-24, Ibukino, Midori-ku Yokohama-shi / JP | 04 /
Okamoto, Hiroo Higashitotsukahaitsu 202, 201-2, Akibacho Totsuka-ku, Yokohama-shi / JP | 05 /
Noguchi, Takaharu Totsukahairaizu 135, 884-1, Kamikuratacho Totsuka-ku, Yokohama-shi / JP | 06 /
Itoh, Shigeyuki 1-2-1107, Kyomachi-3-chome, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi / JP | [1992/36] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Altenburg, Udo, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/36] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner, Galileiplatz 1 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92103200.9 | 25.02.1992 | [1992/36] | Priority number, date | JP19910032612 | 27.02.1991 Original published format: JP 3261291 | [1992/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0501430 | Date: | 02.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0501430 | Date: | 22.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0501430 | Date: | 03.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/30, G11B20/10, G11B20/12 | [1992/36] | CPC: |
G11B27/3027 (EP,US);
G11B20/10 (KR);
G11B20/10527 (EP,US);
G11B20/1208 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1087 (EP,US);
G11B2220/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1992/36] | Title | German: | PCM-Signalaufzeichnungsverfahren und -gerät | [1992/36] | English: | PCM signal recording method and apparatus | [1992/36] | French: | Méthode et appareil d'enregistrement de signaux-MIC | [1992/36] | Examination procedure | 25.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/36] | 14.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 05.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0287376 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5,7,8 * column 3, line 25 - column 6, line 61 * * column 8, line 19 - line 35 * * column 9, line 24 - column 10, line 42; figures 4-6 *; | [DA]DE3916592 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [DA] 1,3,7 * the whole document * * & D,A US-A-4961204 *; | [DA]JPS6486304 ; | [A]GB2217509 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,3,7 * page 7, line 5 - page 12, line 5 * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890718), vol. 13, no. 316, Database accession no. (P - 900), & JP01086304 A 19890331 (SONY CORP.) [DA] 1,3,5,7 * figures of & JP-A-01 086 304 * * abstract * |