Designated contracting states | AT | | DE | | FR | | Examination procedure | 11.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | European patent granted | 13.12.1995 | Opposition procedure | 06.03.1998 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure | published on 22.07.1998 | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 23.02.1996 | | Event description: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Event date: | 16.09.1992 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT DE FR | | Event date: | 13.12.1995 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT DE FR | | Event date: | 10.02.1993 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 19921212 | | Event date: | 15.06.1994 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 19940502 | | Event date: | 13.12.1995 | | Event description: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 131344 | Country of Ref Document: | AT | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 19951215 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | T | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Event date: | 25.01.1996 | | Event description: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 59204639 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 19960125 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Event date: | 03.12.1999 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR ST | Code Expl.: | -NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE | | Event date: | 06.11.1996 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | CLAAS SAULGAU GMBH | Effective DATE: | 19960906 | | Event date: | 27.06.2001 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | MASCHINENFABRIK BERNARD KRONE GMBH | | Event date: | 22.07.1998 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS TERMINATED | Effective DATE: | 19980306 | | Event date: | 28.02.1999 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 19990228 | | Event date: | 01.12.2000 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20001201 | | Event date: | 29.10.1999 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 19991029 | | Event date: | 24.02.1998 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 19980224 | Year of Fee Payment: | 07 | | Event date: | 09.03.1999 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 19990309 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Event date: | 30.12.1997 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 19971230 | Year of Fee Payment: | 07 | | Event date: | 27.10.1995 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 31.07.1992 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 05.06.1998 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: OPPOSITION PROCEDURE CLOSED | | Event date: | 22.08.2008 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION DATA, OPPONENT'S DATA OR THAT OF THE OPPONENT'S REPRESENTATIVE MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009299OPPO | | Event date: | 05.06.1998 | | Event description: | TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE: DATE OF LEGAL EFFECT PUBLISHED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009276 | | Event date: | 19.02.1998 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION PROCEDURE TERMINATED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS OPPC | | Event date: | 03.06.1997 | | Event description: | REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS OBSO | | Event date: | 19.04.1997 | | Event description: | REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS OBSO | | Event date: | 28.02.1997 | | Event description: | REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS OBSO | | Event date: | 03.10.1996 | | Event description: | REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS OBSO | | Event date: | 20.09.1996 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260 | | Event date: | 14.09.1996 | | Event description: | UNPUBLISHED CHANGE TO OPPONENT DATA | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS OPPO | |