EP0502486 - Method for connecting at least one delivery duct to the muffler of a motor-compressor unit, and the motor-compressor unit obtained [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.1995 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.11.1995 [1995/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WHIRLPOOL EUROPE B.V. Luchthavenweg 34 5507 SK Veldhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | For all designated states WHIRLPOOL EUROPE B.V. Luchthavenweg 34 NL-5507 SK Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [1992/37] | For all designated states WHIRLPOOL INTERNATIONAL B.V. Luchthavenweg 34 NL-5507 SK Veldhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bianchi, Vittorio Via Ronco Ferrera di Varese / IT | [1992/37] | Representative(s) | Guerci, Alessandro, et al Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A. Patent Department Viale G. Borghi 27 21025 Comerio (VA) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/39] | Guerci, Alessandro, et al Whirlpool Europe S.r.l. Patent Department Località Cassinetta I-21024 Biandronno (VA) / IT | ||
Former [1994/32] | Melio, Jan Dirk Whirlpool Italia S.r.l., Viale Guido Borghi 27 I-21025 Comerio (Varese) / IT | ||
Former [1992/37] | Melio, Jan Dirk Whirlpool Italia S.r.l., Viale Guido Borghi 27 I-21025 Comerio (Varese) / IT | Application number, filing date | 92103640.6 | 03.03.1992 | [1992/37] | Priority number, date | IT1991MI00569 | 05.03.1991 Original published format: IT MI910569 | [1992/41] |
Former [1992/37] | deleted | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0502486 | Date: | 09.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0502486 | Date: | 07.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16L41/08, F16L5/00, F16L13/14 | [1992/37] | CPC: |
F16L41/082 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1992/37] | Title | German: | Methode zur Verbindung wenigstens einer Förderleitung mit dem Schalldämpfer einer Motor-Kompressoreinheit, und Motor-Kompressor | [1992/37] | English: | Method for connecting at least one delivery duct to the muffler of a motor-compressor unit, and the motor-compressor unit obtained | [1992/37] | French: | Méthode pour connexion au moins d'un tuyau de transport avec l'amortisseur de bruit d'un motocompresseur unité, et le motocompresseur | [1992/37] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1992/41: (deleted) | EPB 1992/37: Priority: 050391 IT MI91000569 | Examination procedure | 01.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/18] | 11.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AT329336B (ANDERSSON RUNE SIGVARD [SE]); | [A]EP0255221 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]); | [AP]DE4007892 |