EP0507092 - Silver halide color photographic light-sensitive material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.1994 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.03.1994 [1994/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/41] | For all designated states KONICA CORPORATION 26-2, Nishi-shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimba, Satoru Konica Corporation, 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Michiue, Kenji Konica Corporation, 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Yabuuchi, Katsuya Konica Corporation, 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Tobita, Keisuke Konica Corporation, 1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi, Tokyo / JP | [1992/41] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/41] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 92103658.8 | 04.03.1992 | [1992/41] | Priority number, date | JP19910037614 | 04.03.1991 Original published format: JP 3761491 | [1992/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0507092 | Date: | 07.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0507092 | Date: | 30.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G03C7/305 | [1993/01] | CPC: |
G03C7/305 (EP);
G03C7/3022 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/41] | G03C7/30 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1992/41] | Title | German: | Farbphotographisches Silberhalogenidmaterial | [1992/41] | English: | Silver halide color photographic light-sensitive material | [1992/41] | French: | Matériau à halogénure d'argent pour photographie en couleurs | [1992/41] | File destroyed: | 28.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 19.03.1993 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 10.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 01 | 01.07.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/10] | 08.10.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/10] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0318992 ; | [Y]US4748106 ; | [Y]EP0317826 |