EP0502513 - Scroll type compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.1996 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.07.1996 [1996/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho 1, Toyoda-cho 2-chome, Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/37] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho 1, Toyoda-cho 2-chome, Kariya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukanuma, Tetsuhiko, c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho, 1, Toyoda-cho 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Izumi, Yuji, c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho, 1, Toyoda-cho 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Mori, Tatsushi, c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho, 1, Toyoda-cho 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 04 /
Yoshida, Tetsuo, c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toyoda Jidoshokki Seisakusho, 1, Toyoda-cho 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [1992/37] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/37] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92103742.0 | 05.03.1992 | [1992/37] | Priority number, date | JP19910040279 | 06.03.1991 Original published format: JP 4027991 | [1992/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0502513 | Date: | 09.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0502513 | Date: | 26.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F04C18/02 | [1992/37] | CPC: |
F04C18/0269 (EP,US);
F04C18/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/37] | Title | German: | Spiralverdichter | [1992/37] | English: | Scroll type compressor | [1992/37] | French: | Compresseur à volutes | [1992/37] | Examination procedure | 05.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/37] | 22.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0010402 (SANKYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) |