EP0503484 - Monoclonal antibodies as antidotes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISTITUTO NAZIONALE PER LO STUDIO E LA CURA DEI TUMORI Via Giacomo Venezian, 1 I-20133 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/38] | For all designated states ISTITUTO NAZIONALE PER LO STUDIO E LA CURA DEI TUMORI Via Giacomo Venezian, 1 I-20133 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ghione, Mario Via Venezian, 1 I-20133 Milano / IT | 02 /
Balsari, Andrea Via Venezian, 1 I-20133 Milano / IT | 03 /
Colnaghi, Maria Ines Via Venezian, 1 I-20133 Milano / IT | [1992/38] | Representative(s) | Minoja, Fabrizio Bianchetti & Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/38] | Minoja, Fabrizio Studio Consulenza Brevettuale, Via Rossini, 8 I-20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 92103801.4 | 06.03.1992 | [1992/38] | Priority number, date | IT1991MI00660 | 12.03.1991 Original published format: IT MI910660 | [1992/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0503484 | Date: | 16.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0503484 | Date: | 02.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0503484 | Date: | 27.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61K31/71, // (A61K39/395, 31:71) | [1992/38] | CPC: |
A61K31/70 (EP);
A61K39/395 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P39/02 (EP);
C07K16/44 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K39/395, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1992/38] | Title | German: | Monoklonale Antikörper als Antidote | [1992/38] | English: | Monoclonal antibodies as antidotes | [1992/38] | French: | Anticorps monoclonaux comme antidotes | [1992/38] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Miscellaneous | EPB 1992/40: (deleted) | EPB 1992/38: Priority: 120391 IT MI91000660 | Examination procedure | 10.11.1993 | Examination requested [1994/03] | 22.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 13.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 27.11.1996 | GR | 27.11.1996 | [2002/25] |
Former [2000/05] | GR | 27.11.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0316776 (IST NAZ STUD CURA DEI TUMORI [IT]); | [A]WO8904671 (OREGON STATE [US]) | [XD] - RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS IN CHEMICAL PATHOLOGY AND PHARMACOLOGY vol. 29, no. 3, 1980, WESTBURY,N.Y.,USA pages 549 - 559 SAVARAJ ET AL 'IMMUNOLOGICAL MODIFICATION OF ADRIAMYCIN CARDIOTOXICITY' | [XD] - PROCEEDINGS,71ST ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH,16TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY vol. 21, 1980, SAN DIEGO,CA,USA page 254 SAVARAJ ET AL 'STUDIES OF ADRIAMYCIN-SPECIFIC ANTIBODY (ADR-AB) AS A MODIFIER OF ADRIAMYCIN (ADR) CARDIOTOXICITY' ABSTRACT 1020 | [YD] - ANTICANCER RESEARCH vol. 10, no. 1, 1990, ATHENS,GR pages 129 - 132 BALSARI ET AL 'A NEW MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY RECOGNIZING ANTHRACYCLINIC MOLECULE' | [A] - CANCER BIOCHEM.BIOPHYS. vol. 10, 1989, LONDON,U.K. pages 247 - 256 TSUKADA ET AL 'THE EFFECT OF BISPECIFIC MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY RECOGNIZING BOTH HEPATOMA-SPECIFIC MEMBRANE GLYCOPROTEIN AND ANTHRACYCLINE DRUGS ON THE METASTATIC GROWTH OF HEPATOMA AN66' | [XP] - INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CANCER vol. 47, no. 6, 1 April 1991, GENEVA,CH pages 889 - 892 BALSARI ET AL 'ANTI-DRUG MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES ANTAGONIZE TOXIC EFFECT MORE THAN ANTI-TUMOR ACTIVITY OF DOXORUBICIN' | [XP] - INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CANCER vol. 50, no. 4, 20 February 1992, GENEVA,CH pages 617 - 620 SARDINI ET AL 'AN ANTI-DOXORUBICIN MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY MODULATES KINETIC AND DYNAMIC CHARACTERISTICS OF THE DRUG' | Examination | - INTERNATL. JOURNAL OF CANCER, vol. 47, no. 6, 01 April 1991, Geneva (CH); BALSARI et al., pp. 889-892/ | - INTERNATL. JOURNAL OF CANCER, vol. 50, no. 4, 20 February 1992, Geneva (CH); SARDINI et al., pp. 617-620/ |