EP0503534 - Vehicle tyre with sinusoidal circumferential grooves [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.07.1996 [1996/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Aktiengesellschaft Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/38] | For all designated states Continental Aktiengesellschaft Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 D-30165 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ramcke, Uwe Hülperdinger Weg 32 W-3030 Walsrode / DE | 02 /
Trabandt, Hagen Händelweg 7 W-3163 Sehnde 1 / DE | [1992/38] | Application number, filing date | 92103996.2 | 09.03.1992 | [1992/38] | Priority number, date | DE19914107916 | 12.03.1991 Original published format: DE 4107916 | [1992/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0503534 | Date: | 16.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0503534 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0503534 | Date: | 12.07.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B60C11/04 | [1995/28] | CPC: |
B60C11/045 (EP,US);
B60C11/0309 (EP,US);
Y10S152/01 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/38] | B60C11/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1992/38] | Title | German: | Fahrzeugreifen mit wellenförmigen Längsrillen | [1992/38] | English: | Vehicle tyre with sinusoidal circumferential grooves | [1992/38] | French: | Bandage pneumatique pour véhicules ayant des rainures circonférencielles ondulées | [1992/38] | Examination procedure | 22.01.1993 | Examination requested [1993/12] | 13.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0069464 (DUNLOP LTD [GB]); | [A]EP0123135 (CONTINENTAL GUMMI WERKE AG [DE]); | [A]EP0189199 (CONTINENTAL GUMMI WERKE AG [DE]) | by applicant | US3055410 | EP0173101 |