EP0507112 - Hinged-lid package, especially for cigarettes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co. KG) Siemensstrasse 10 27283 Verden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/41] | For all designated states Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co.) Siemensstrasse 10 D-27283 Verden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Focke, Heinz Moorstrasse 64 D-27283 Verden / DE | 02 /
Granz, Helmut Ostlandstrasse 116 D-27283 Verden / DE | [1995/28] |
Former [1992/41] | 01 /
Focke, Heinz Moorstrasse 64 W-2810 Verden / DE | ||
02 /
Granz, helmut Ostlandstrasse 116 W-2810 Verden / DE | Representative(s) | Bolte, Erich, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Bolte, Erich, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [1994/40] | Bolte, Erich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Patentanwälte Hollerallee 73 D-28209 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [1992/41] | Bolte, Erich, Dipl.-Ing. c/o Meissner, Bolte & Partner Patentanwälte Hollerallee 73 D-28209 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 92104056.4 | 10.03.1992 | [1992/41] | Priority number, date | DE19914109702 | 23.03.1991 Original published format: DE 4109702 | [1992/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0507112 | Date: | 07.10.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0507112 | Date: | 30.12.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0507112 | Date: | 12.07.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B65D85/10, B65D5/66 | [1992/41] | CPC: |
B65D5/6691 (EP,US);
B65D85/10484 (EP,US);
B65D85/10564 (EP,US);
B65D2301/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1992/41] | Title | German: | Klappschachtel, insbesondere für Zigaretten | [1992/41] | English: | Hinged-lid package, especially for cigarettes | [1992/41] | French: | Emballage à couvercle rabattant, en particulier pour cigarettes | [1992/41] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1995/28: Teilanmeldung 94119587.7 eingereicht am 10/03/92 | EPB 1995/28: Divisional application 94119587.7 filed on 10/03/92 | EPB 1995/28: Demande divisionnaire 94119587.7 déposée le 10/03/92 | Examination procedure | 15.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/19] | 24.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP94119587.7 / EP0650907 | Opposition(s) | 13.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB2059387 (BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO CO); | [A]CH380013 (SCHMERMUND ALFRED [DE]); | [A]US2247870 (WALKER CHALMERS JOHN); | [A]EP0205766 ; | [A]DE1062172 (MOLINS MACHINE CO LTD); | [AP]EP0434962 (FOCKE & CO [DE]) |