EP0503635 - Oil supply system in internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.05.1995 [1995/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-go, 1-ban, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/38] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-go, 1-ban, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Urata, Yasuhiro, c/o K. K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 1-go, 4-ban, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Kumagai, Kazuhide, c/o K. K. Honda Gijutsu Kenky. 1-go, 4-ban, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Suzuki, Shigeru, c/o K. K. Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 1-go, 4-ban, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama-ken / JP | [1992/38] | Representative(s) | Fincke, Karl Theodor, et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | Fincke, Karl Theodor, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/38] | Fincke, Karl Theodor, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92104300.6 | 12.03.1992 | [1992/38] | Priority number, date | JP19910015489U | 15.03.1991 Original published format: JP 1548991 U | [1992/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0503635 | Date: | 16.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0503635 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F01M1/02, F01M1/12 | [1992/38] | CPC: |
F01M1/02 (EP,US);
F01L9/14 (EP,US);
F01M1/12 (EP,US);
F01L2001/34446 (EP,US);
F01L2820/045 (EP,US);
F01M2001/123 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1992/38] | Title | German: | Ölzufuhrsystem in einer Brennkraftmaschine | [1992/38] | English: | Oil supply system in internal combustion engine | [1992/38] | French: | Système d'alimentation en huile pour un moteur à combustion interne | [1992/38] | Examination procedure | 13.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/41] | 15.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE316612 ; | [Y]FR2605677 (RENAULT [FR]); | [A]EP0406527 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) |