EP0508149 - Low noise high power optical fiber amplifier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.1997 [1997/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL INSTRUMENT CORPORATION OF DELAWARE 181 West Madison Street Chicago Illinois 60602 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/38] | For all designated states GENERAL INSTRUMENT CORPORATION OF DELAWARE 181 West Madison Street Chicago, Illinois 60602 / US | ||
Former [1994/31] | For all designated states GI CORPORATION 2200 Byberry Road Hatboro, Pennsylvania 19040 / US | ||
Former [1992/42] | For all designated states GENERAL INSTRUMENT CORPORATION 2200 Byberry Road Hatboro, Pennsylvania 19040 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huber, David R. 68 Country Club Drive Warrington, Pennsylvania 18976 / US | [1992/42] | Representative(s) | Beck, Jürgen HOEGER, STELLRECHT & PARTNER Patentanwälte Uhlandstrasse 14 c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/42] | Beck, Jürgen Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14c D-70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 92104337.8 | 13.03.1992 | [1992/42] | Priority number, date | US19910681986 | 08.04.1991 Original published format: US 681986 | [1992/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0508149 | Date: | 14.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0508149 | Date: | 14.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0508149 | Date: | 10.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/06, H01S3/094 | [1992/42] | CPC: |
H01S3/094003 (EP,US);
H01S2303/00 (EP,US);
H01S3/094011 (EP,US);
H01S3/094096 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/42] | Title | German: | Rauscharmer, faseroptischer Hochleistungs-Verstärker | [1996/02] | English: | Low noise high power optical fiber amplifier | [1992/42] | French: | Amplificateur à fibre optique à faible bruit et à haute puissance | [1996/02] |
Former [1992/42] | Rauscharmer faseroptischer Verstärker | ||
Former [1992/42] | Amplificateur à fibre optique à faible bruit | Examination procedure | 23.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/46] | 25.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 05.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP02239237 ; | [XP]DE4005867 (STANDARD ELEKTRIK LORENZ AG [DE]); | [E]EP0497246 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [E]EP0508880 (ALCATEL NV [NL]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 558 (P-1141)12 December 1990 & JP-A-02 239 237 ( NIPPON TELEGR. & TELEPH. ) 21 September 1990, & JP02239237 A 19900921 | [Y] - ELECTRONICS LETTERS. vol. 27, no. 2, 17 January 1991, STEVENAGE GB pages 146 - 148 Y. KIMURA ET AL. 'Noise figure characteristics of Er3+ doped fibre amplifier pumped in 0.8 mum band' | [A] - ELECTRONICS LETTERS. vol. 27, no. 3, 31 January 1991, STEVENAGE GB pages 211 - 213 W.I. WAY ET AL. 'High gain limiting erbium-doped fibre amplifier with over 30dB dynamic range' | [A] - ELECTRONICS LETTERS. vol. 26, no. 8, 14 April 1990, STEVENAGE GB pages 500 - 501 H. TAGA ET AL. '459 km, 2.4 Gbit/s four wavelength multiplexing optical fibre transmission experiment using six Er-doped fibre amplifiers' |