EP0505848 - Piezo-electric motor, in particular for timepiece [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.1996 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.1996 [1996/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eta SA Fabriques d'Ebauches Schild-Rust-Strasse 17 2540 Granges / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1992/40] | For all designated states Eta SA Fabriques d'Ebauches Schild-Rust-Strasse 17 CH-2540 Granges / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Péclat, Christian Witmattstrasse 5 CH-2540 Granges / CH | 02 /
Wind Hans, Maarten St-Cergue 54bis CH-1260 Nyon / CH | [1992/40] | Representative(s) | Caron, Gérard, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Rue des Sors 7 2074 Marin / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1992/40] | Caron, Gérard, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Passage Max. Meuron 6 CH-2001 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 92104360.0 | 13.03.1992 | [1992/40] | Priority number, date | CH19910000949 | 28.03.1991 Original published format: CH 94991 | [1992/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0505848 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0505848 | Date: | 30.08.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G04C3/12, H01L41/09 | [1992/40] | CPC: |
H02N2/103 (EP,US);
H02N2/00 (KR);
G04C3/12 (EP,US);
H02N2/001 (EP,US);
H02N2/0085 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1992/40] | Title | German: | Piezoelektrischer Motor, insbesondere für Zeitmessgerät | [1992/40] | English: | Piezo-electric motor, in particular for timepiece | [1992/40] | French: | Moteur piézo-électrique, notamment pour pièce d'horlogerie | [1992/40] | Examination procedure | 13.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/50] | 17.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP63120277 ; | [A]US3595007 (BAKER HUGH M JR); | [A]GB2044014 (SP P KONSTRUKT I TEKHNOLOG BJU) |