EP0503670 - Peristaltic intravenous infusion pump capable of displaying an application name selected [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.1997 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.05.1997 [1997/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | For all designated states Baxter International Inc. One Baxter Parkway Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/38] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | ||
For all designated states BAXTER INTERNATIONAL INC. One Baxter Parkway Deerfield, IL 60015 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maeda, Akihiro 295, Yubuneiwakura, Wazuka-cho Souraku-gun, Kyoto-fu / JP | 02 /
Lynn, Kenneth 118 Springbrook Court McHenry, Illinois 60050 / US | 03 /
Gluth, Michael 2422 E. Northwood Court Arlington Heights, Illinois 60004 / US | [1992/38] | Representative(s) | Müller, Frithjof E. Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/38] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92104412.9 | 13.03.1992 | [1992/38] | Priority number, date | JP19910049898 | 14.03.1991 Original published format: JP 4989891 | JP19920046776 | 04.03.1992 Original published format: JP 4677692 | [1992/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0503670 | Date: | 16.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0503670 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0503670 | Date: | 22.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/172 | [1992/38] | CPC: |
A61M5/172 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/38] | Title | German: | Peristaltische intravenöse Infusionspumpe mit Anzeige einer gewählten Anwendung | [1996/21] | English: | Peristaltic intravenous infusion pump capable of displaying an application name selected | [1992/38] | French: | Pompe d'infusion intraveineuse peristaltique capable d'afficher le nom de l'application sélectionnée | [1992/38] |
Former [1992/38] | Peristaltische intravenöse Infusionspumpe, die imstande ist, den Namen der ausgewählten Verwendung anzuzeigen | Examination procedure | 18.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/20] | 12.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0384155 [ ]; | WO8400894 [ ]; | EP0192786 [ ] | Examination | EP0319268 | FR2603488 | US4624661 |