Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0504770 | Global Dossier | 25.09.1996 | B1 | EP0504770 | 23.09.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4108940 | 19.03.1991 | DE4114422 | 03.05.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE143233T | 15.10.1996 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE4108940 | 19.03.1991 | DE4114422 | 03.05.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4114422 | 21.12.1995 | C2 | DE4114422 | 24.09.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4108940 | 19.03.1991 | DE4114422 | 03.05.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59207214D1 | 31.10.1996 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE4108940 | 19.03.1991 | DE4114422 | 03.05.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5353716 | 11.10.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4108940 | 19.03.1991 | DE4114422 | 03.05.1991 |