EP0494090 - Photovoltaic device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.11.1995 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.11.1995 | Refusal of application | published on 27.12.1995 [1995/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANEGAFUCHI KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-4 Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/28] | For all designated states KANEGAFUCHI KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-4 Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamagishi, Hideo 1-322-302 Kitaochiai 1-chome Suma-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Kondo, Masataka 8-15, Kitagoyo 2-chome, Kita-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Nishimura, Kunio 82-7, Misasagichiarai-cho, Yamashina-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP | 04 /
Hiroe, Akihiko 6-31-17, Shioya-cho, Tarumi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 05 /
Asaoka, Keizou 6-31-17, Shioya-cho, Tarumi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 06 /
Tsuge, Kazunori 8-24, Takamaru 1-chome, Tarumi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 07 /
Tawada, Yoshihisa 14-39, Oikemiyamadai, Kita-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | 08 /
Yamaguchi, Minori 5-40, Higashihitomuru-cho Akashi-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [1993/03] |
Former [1992/43] | 01 /
Yamagishi, Hideo 1-322-302 Kitaochiai 1-chome Suma-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Kondo, Masataka 8-15, Kitagoyo 2-chome, Kita-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Nishimura, Kunio 82-7, Misasagichiarai-cho, Yamashina-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP | |||
04 /
Hiroe, Akihiko 6-31-17, Shioya-cho, Tarumi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | |||
05 /
Asaoka, Keizou 6-31-17, Shioya-cho, Tarumi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | |||
06 /
Tsuge, Kazunori 9-30, Maikodai 2-chome, Tarumi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | |||
07 /
Tawada, Yoshihisa 14-39, Oikemiyamadai, Kita-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | |||
08 /
Yamaguchi, Minori 5-40, Higashihitomuru-cho Akashi-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | |||
Former [1992/28] | 01 /
Yamagishi, Hideo 6-5-12, Maikodai 6-chome, Tarumi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Kondo, Masataka 8-15, Kitagoyo 2-chome, Kita-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Nishimura, Kunio 82-7, Misasagichiarai-cho, Yamashina-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP | |||
04 /
Hiroe, Akihiko 6-31-17, Shioya-cho, Tarumi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | |||
05 /
Asaoka, Keizou 6-31-17, Shioya-cho, Tarumi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | |||
06 /
Tsuge, Kazunori 9-30, Maikodai 2-chome, Tarumi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | |||
07 /
Tawada, Yoshihisa 14-39, Oikemiyamadai, Kita-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | |||
08 /
Yamaguchi, Minori 5-40, Higashihitomuru-cho Akashi-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/28] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 92104633.0 | 01.11.1986 | [1992/28] | Priority number, date | JP19850247463 | 05.11.1985 Original published format: JP 24746385 | JP19850255681 | 14.11.1985 Original published format: JP 25568185 | JP19860099939 | 30.04.1986 Original published format: JP 9993986 | [1992/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0494090 | Date: | 08.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0494090 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/075, H01L31/20 | [1992/28] | CPC: |
H01L31/075 (EP,US);
H01L31/00 (KR);
H01L31/202 (EP,US);
H01L31/204 (EP,US);
Y02E10/548 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1992/28] | Title | German: | Fotovoltaische Vorrichtung | [1992/28] | English: | Photovoltaic device | [1992/28] | French: | Dispositif photovoltaique | [1992/28] | Examination procedure | 08.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/46] | 01.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1995/52] | 13.08.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/52] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP86115170.2 / EP0221523 | Request for further processing for: | 14.03.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 14.03.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.04.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP56150876 ; | [X]GB2137810 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN); | [X]EP0099720 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO [JP]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 6, no. 32 (E-96)(910) 25 February 1982 & JP-A-56 150 876 ( SANYO DENKI KK ) 21 November 1981, & JP56150876 A 19811121 |