EP0513495 - Liquid container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.1996 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.02.1996 [1996/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toppan Printing Co., Ltd. 5-1, Taito 1-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/47] | For all designated states TOPPAN PRINTING CO. LTD. 5-1, Taito 1-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sada, Jun, c/o TOPPAN PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-5-1, Taito, Taito, Taito-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Take, Yoshiaki, c/o TOPPAN PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-5-1, Taito, Taito, Taito-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Togi, Toshihide, c/o TOPPAN PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-5-1, Taito, Taito, Taito-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Fujima, Masatoshi, c/o TOPPAN PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-5-1, Taito, Taito, Taito-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Uematsu, Masahiro, c/o TOPPAN PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-5-1, Taito, Taito, Taito-ku Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Ito, Takashi, c/o TOPPAN PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-5-1, Taito, Taito, Taito-ku Tokyo / JP | 07 /
Hirahara, Rie, c/o TOPPAN PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-5-1, Taito, Taito, Taito-ku Tokyo / JP | 08 /
Igarashi, Makoto, c/o TOPPAN PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-5-1, Taito, Taito, Taito-ku Tokyo / JP | 09 /
Yamazaki, Nobumasa, c/o TOPPAN PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-5-1, Taito, Taito, Taito-ku Tokyo / JP | [1992/47] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/47] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92104673.6 | 18.03.1992 | [1992/47] | Priority number, date | JP19910023782U | 19.03.1991 Original published format: JP 2378291 U | JP19910023783U | 19.03.1991 Original published format: JP 2378391 U | JP19910052307U | 11.06.1991 Original published format: JP 5230791 U | JP19910067342U | 31.07.1991 Original published format: JP 6734291 U | JP19910095857U | 25.10.1991 Original published format: JP 9585791 U | JP19910295814 | 12.11.1991 Original published format: JP 29581491 | JP19920005784U | 20.01.1992 Original published format: JP 578492 U | [1992/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0513495 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0513495 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0513495 | Date: | 15.02.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/74, B65D77/06 | [1992/47] | CPC: |
B65D5/746 (EP,US);
B65D77/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1992/47] | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitsbehälter | [1992/47] | English: | Liquid container | [1992/47] | French: | Récipient pour liquides | [1992/47] | Examination procedure | 09.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/14] | 17.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4572422 (HEUBERGER ERICH [DE], et al) |