EP0504849 - PCM signal recording system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.12.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/39] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hatanaka, Yuji 254 Keimeiryo, 850, Maiokacho, Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Takeuchi, Toshifumi D109 Obirin-Heights, 307-2, Minesawacho Hodogaya-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Arai, Takao 65-24, Ibukino, Midori-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1992/39] | Representative(s) | Altenburg, Udo, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Altenburg, Udo, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/39] | Altenburg, Udo, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Frohwitter . Geissler & Partner, Galileiplatz 1 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92104701.5 | 18.03.1992 | [1992/39] | Priority number, date | JP19910052184 | 18.03.1991 Original published format: JP 5218491 | [1992/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0504849 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0504849 | Date: | 23.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0504849 | Date: | 05.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/12, G11B20/18, G11B20/10 | [1994/47] | CPC: |
G11B20/10527 (EP,US);
G11B20/1262 (EP,US);
G11B20/1809 (EP,US);
G11B20/1876 (EP,US);
G11B5/00891 (EP,US);
H04N5/78213 (EP,US);
H04N5/928 (EP,US);
H04N9/802 (EP,US);
G11B2020/1087 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1992/39] | G11B20/10, G11B20/12, G11B20/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/39] | Title | German: | PCM-Signal Aufzeichnungssystem | [1992/39] | English: | PCM signal recording system | [1992/39] | French: | Système d'enregistrement de signaux PCM | [1992/39] | Examination procedure | 18.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/39] | 26.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0389006 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1* column 5, line 16 - line 57; figure 3 *; | [A]EP0397472 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,12 * column 5, line 40 - column 7, line 38; figures 1,2,8 *; | [A]DE3916892 (LINDE AG [DE]) [A] 1,12 * column 9, line 19 - column 10, line 2; figures 6,14 *; | [A] - SEIJI HIGURASHI ET AL., "Digital sound systems of S-VHS VCR", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, NEW YORK, US, (199008), vol. 36, no. 3, pages 642 - 645, XP000162901 [A] 1,2,12 * page 644, paragraph 3.; figures 4,5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/30.103186 |