EP0494091 - Apparatus for opening flattened tubes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.1997 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.06.1997 [1997/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Windmöller & Hölscher Münsterstrasse 50 D-49525 Lengerich / DE | [1992/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Upmeier, Hartmut, Dipl.-Ing. Jahnstrasse 25 W-4540 Lengerich / DE | [1992/28] | Representative(s) | Gossel, Hans K., et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/28] | Gossel, Hans K., Dipl.-Ing., et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92104728.8 | 03.04.1987 | [1992/28] | Priority number, date | DE19863612497 | 14.04.1986 Original published format: DE 3612497 | DE19863616666 | 16.05.1986 Original published format: DE 3616666 | [1992/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0494091 | Date: | 08.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0494091 | Date: | 21.04.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0494091 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B29C53/20, B29C55/28, B29C47/00 | [1993/16] | CPC: |
B29C55/285 (EP,US);
B26D3/162 (EP,US);
D06H7/12 (EP,US);
Y10T29/1125 (EP,US);
Y10T29/115 (EP,US);
Y10T83/219 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/28] | B29C53/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1992/28] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Aufweiten einer Folienschlauchbahn aus thermoplastischem Kunststoff | [1992/28] | English: | Apparatus for opening flattened tubes | [1992/28] | French: | Dispositif pour ouvrir des tubes mis à plat | [1992/28] | Examination procedure | 16.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/50] | 09.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP87104994.6 / EP0245643 | Opposition(s) | 04.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US1504255 ; | [A]US1601550 (ABBOTT JR ADRIAN O); | [Y]US2644522 (PARKER SAMUEL P, et al); | [A]US2781589 (CORNWELL RICHARD E); | [X]US2962792 (EVANS WALTER W, et al); | [A]US3313870 (MASAHIDE YAZAWA); | [A]DE2052150 (POLYMER PROCESSING RES INST); | [A]US3661482 (BROWN STUART L JR); | [A]DE2164282 (WINDMOELLER & HOELSCHER); | [A]US4227957 (KEUCHEL HERBERT W, et al); | [A]US4439260 (CANTERINO PETER J [US], et al) |