EP0504878 - Image recording apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/39] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sasai, Keizo, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | 02 /
Yoshida, Takehiro, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | 03 /
Iwata, Masakatsu, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | 04 /
Kobayashi, Makoto, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | 05 /
Yokoyama, Minoru, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | 06 /
Fuse, Takashi, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | 07 /
Sawada, Hirohisa, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | 08 /
Tomoda, Akihiro, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | 09 /
Nakamura, Fumihiko, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | [1992/39] | Representative(s) | Tiedtke, Harro, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/39] | Tiedtke, Harro, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92104785.8 | 19.03.1992 | [1992/39] | Priority number, date | JP19910080643 | 20.03.1991 Original published format: JP 8064391 | JP19910173686 | 15.07.1991 Original published format: JP 17368691 | [1992/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0504878 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0504878 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0504878 | Date: | 04.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B41J17/36 | [1992/39] | CPC: |
B41J11/42 (EP,US);
B41J17/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1992/39] | Title | German: | Bildaufzeichnungsvorrichtung | [1992/39] | English: | Image recording apparatus | [1992/39] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement d'image | [1992/39] | Examination procedure | 12.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/36] | 19.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 04.06.1997 | IT | 04.06.1997 | [2002/25] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 04.06.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP60184865 ; | [A]JP58134780 ; | [A]JP58108175 ; | [X]JP61213182 ; | [A]JP60236779 ; | [X]JP61141580 ; | [A]EP0411540 (CANON KK [JP]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 29 (M-451)(2086) 5 February 1986 & JP-A-60 184 865 ( SUWA SEIKOSHA K.K. ) 20 September 1985, & JP60184865 A 19850920 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 250 (M-254)(1395) 8 November 1983 & JP-A-58 134 780 ( FUJI XEROX K.K. ) 11 August 1983, & JP58134780 A 19830811 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 215 (M-244)(1360) 22 September 1983 & JP-A-58 108 175 ( NIPPON DENSHIN DENWA KOSHA ) 28 June 1983, & JP58108175 A 19830628 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 50 (M-562)(2497) 17 February 1987 & JP-A-61 213 182 ( MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP ) 22 September 1986, & JP61213182 A 19860922 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 100 (M-470)(2157) 16 April 1986 & JP-A-60 236 779 ( FUJI XEROX K.K. ) 25 November 1985, & JP60236779 A 19851125 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 336 (M-535)(2392) 14 November 1986 & JP-A-61 141 580 ( MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD ) 28 June 1986, & JP61141580 A 19860628 |