EP0509270 - Method and apparatus for the elctro-optical scanning of (cigarette) packs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co. KG) Siemensstrasse 10 27283 Verden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/43] | For all designated states Focke & Co. (GmbH & Co.) Siemensstrasse 10 D-27283 Verden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Focke, Heinz Moorstrasse 64 W-2810 Verden / DE | 02 /
Dreyer, Uwe Siegelberg 86 W-5600 Wuppertal 23 / DE | [1992/43] | Representative(s) | Bolte, Erich, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Bolte, Erich, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Hollerallee 73 28209 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [1992/43] | Bolte, Erich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Patentanwälte Hollerallee 73 D-28209 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 92105019.1 | 24.03.1992 | [1992/43] | Priority number, date | DE19914112263 | 15.04.1991 Original published format: DE 4112263 | [1992/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0509270 | Date: | 21.10.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0509270 | Date: | 07.07.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0509270 | Date: | 28.08.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B07C5/342, G06K7/10, B07C5/10, B65B19/28 | [1993/25] | CPC: |
B65B19/28 (EP,US);
B07C5/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/43] | B07C5/342, G06K7/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1992/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum elektro-optischen Abtasten von (Zigaretten-)Packungen | [1992/43] | English: | Method and apparatus for the elctro-optical scanning of (cigarette) packs | [1992/43] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de lecture électro-optique de paquets (de cigarettes) | [1992/43] | Examination procedure | 10.12.1993 | Examination requested [1994/05] | 10.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]DE3942932 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0258810 (MAKI MFG CO LTD [JP]); | [A]FR2416060 (LAESSIG FOERDERTECH HAMBURG [DE]); | [A]EP0342384 (FOCKE & CO [DE]) |