EP0505981 - Semiconductor wafer testing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reitinger, Erich Industriestrasse 6 D-82110 Germering / DE | [1992/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1992/40] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/40] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Postfach 44 01 51 D-80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92105051.4 | 24.03.1992 | [1992/40] | Priority number, date | DE19914109908 | 26.03.1991 Original published format: DE 4109908 | [1992/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0505981 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0505981 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0505981 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/26, G01R31/30, G01R31/28, H01L21/00, G01R1/04 | [1994/12] | CPC: |
G01R31/2831 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/40] | G01R31/26, G01R31/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/40] | Title | German: | Anordnung zur Prüfung von Halbleiter-Wafern oder dergleichen | [1992/40] | English: | Semiconductor wafer testing device | [1992/40] | French: | Dispositif d'essai de wafers semi-conducteurs | [1992/40] | Examination procedure | 10.05.1994 | Examination requested [1994/28] | 07.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.11.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 10.06.1998 | DK | 10.09.1998 | [2003/45] |
Former [2001/23] | GR | 10.06.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3710251 (HAGGE J, et al) [A] 1 * column A; figure 1 *; | [A]US4607220 (HOLLMAN KENNETH F [US]) [A] 1 * column 5, line 11 - line 21; figures 1-3 *; | [A]JPH01157544 (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD); | [A]US4845426 (NOLAN CHARLES C [US], et al) [A] 1 * column A; figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP0341156 (SAGEM [FR]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 9, line 3 - line 26 * * column 5, line 6 - line 22 *; | [A]DE3914699 (GOURDON S A ETS [FR]) [A] 3* column 8, line 23 - line 31 *; | [A]FR2645679 (ONERA (OFF NAT AEROSPATIALE) [FR]) [A] 3 * page 7, line 29 - line 31; figure 2 *; | [AP]US5084671 (MIYATA EIJI [JP], et al) [AP] 1 * column 4, line 41 - line 45; figures 1,14,22,23 * * column 13, line 56 - line 64 * |