Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] |
18.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.12.1996 [1996/49] |
27.10.1995 | (Expected) grant | published on 13.12.1995 [1995/50] |
14.07.1994 | Change - representative | published on 31.08.1994 [1994/35] |
03.03.1994 | First examination report | |
08.06.1993 | Request for examination filed | published on 28.07.1993 [1993/30] |
05.10.1992 | Publication of search report | published on 25.11.1992 [1992/48] |
28.08.1992 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 14.10.1992 [1992/42] |