EP0508229 - A method of preparing a fluoroolefin based copolymer useful in electrodepositionpaints [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/42] | Fluoroolefin based copolymer useful in electrodeposition paints | ||
[1995/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.1996 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTRAL GLASS COMPANY, LIMITED 5253, Oaza Okiube Yamaguchi City, Yamaguchi Prefecture / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/42] | For all designated states CENTRAL GLASS COMPANY, LIMITED 5253, Oaza Okiube Yamaguchi City, Yamaguchi Prefecture / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koishi, Toshio 4-12-21, Tsurumai Sakado City / JP | 02 /
Ootani, Mikio 2-10-31, Senba-cho Kawagoe City / JP | 03 /
Koshita, Toru 837-12, Oaza Suna Kawagoe City / JP | [1992/42] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/35] | Dipl.-Phys.Dr. Manitz Dipl.-Ing. Finsterwald Dipl.-Ing. Grämkow Dipl.Chem.Dr. Heyn Dipl.Phys. Rotermund Morgan, B.Sc.(Phys.) Postfach 22 16 11 D-80506 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/42] | Dipl.-Phys.Dr. Manitz Dipl.-Ing. Finsterwald Dipl.-Ing. Grämkow Dipl.-Chem.Dr. Heyn Dipl.-Phys. Rotermund Morgan, B.Sc.(Phys) Postfach 22 16 11 D-80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92105229.6 | 26.03.1992 | [1992/42] | Priority number, date | JP19910076377 | 09.04.1991 Original published format: JP 7637791 | JP19910091838 | 23.04.1991 Original published format: JP 9183891 | [1992/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0508229 | Date: | 14.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0508229 | Date: | 25.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0508229 | Date: | 13.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C08F214/18, C08F218/04, C08F216/14, C08L27/12 | [1992/42] | CPC: |
C09D5/4407 (EP,US);
C08F214/188 (EP,US);
C08F218/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/42] | Title | German: | VerFahren zur Herstellung von Copolymere auf Basis von Fluoroolefinen zum Gebrauch in Elektroabscheidungslacken | [1995/50] | English: | A method of preparing a fluoroolefin based copolymer useful in electrodepositionpaints | [1995/50] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'une copolymère à base de fluoro-oléfines utilisable dans des peintures par électro-déposition | [1995/50] |
Former [1992/42] | Copolymere auf Basis von Fluoroolefinen zum Gebrauch in Elektroabscheidungslacken | ||
Former [1992/42] | Fluoroolefin based copolymer useful in electrodeposition paints | ||
Former [1992/42] | Copolymère à base de fluoro-oléfines utilisable dans des peintures par électro-déposition | Examination procedure | 25.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/30] | 08.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4954589 (SUGAWARA KIYOMI [JP], et al) |