EP0508246 - Stopper rod having an erosion-resistant sleeve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.09.1998 [1998/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VESUVIUS FRANCE S.A. 68, rue Paul Deudon, B.P. 19 59750 Feignies / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1997/41] | For all designated states VESUVIUS FRANCE S.A. 68, rue Paul Deudon, B.P. 19 59750 Feignies / FR | ||
Former [1992/42] | For all designated states VESUVIUS FRANCE S.A. 68, rue Paul Deudon, B.P. 19 F-59750 Feignies / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ruffaldi, Aldo 267 Avenue Baron d'Huard B-1950 Kraainem / BE | [1992/42] | Representative(s) | Delcoux, Mariette Office Kirkpatrick S.A. Avenue Wolfers, 32 1310 La Hulpe / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/30] | Bairiot-Delcoux, Mariette Office Kirkpatrick S.A., Avenue Wolfers, 32 1310 La Hulpe / BE | Application number, filing date | 92105388.0 | 28.03.1992 | [1992/42] | Priority number, date | FR19910004403 | 09.04.1991 Original published format: FR 9104403 | [1992/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0508246 | Date: | 14.10.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0508246 | Date: | 08.10.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B22D41/18 | [1992/42] | CPC: |
B22D41/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT, SE [1992/42] | Title | German: | Stopfenstange mit verschliessfester Hülse | [1992/42] | English: | Stopper rod having an erosion-resistant sleeve | [1992/42] | French: | Quenouille comportant une manchette résistant à l'érosion | [1992/42] | Examination procedure | 19.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/52] | 20.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP63104760 ; | [X]US3456690 (WEED SETH E); | [X]US3011231 (ROSS DREVER JAMES); | [X]US1486694 (SHEAFFER JAMES E); | [X]GB2123726 (THORNTON JAMES MENZIES); | [Y]FR2464769 (AKECHI TAIKARENGA KK [JP]); | [Y]WO8404477 (THORNTON JAMES MENZIES) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 343 (M-741)(31890) 14 Septembre 1988 & JP-A-63 104 760 ( SUMITOMO METAL IND LTD ) 10 Mai 1988, & JP63104760 A 00000000 | Examination | JPH01130857 |